YPL (YOUNG PEOPLE LITTLEPORT)

Charity number: 1127679
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £154.15k £152.76k £172.09k £138.57k £240.11k
Total expenditure £156.12k £162.05k £169.56k £139.82k £238.35k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £62.00k