Financial history THE DERWENT INITIATIVE

Charity number: 1126951
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £82.35k £72.99k £70.20k £83.97k £66.64k
Total expenditure £81.95k £76.72k £49.59k £82.66k £86.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £36.04k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A