LEICESTER CITY FOOTBALL CLUB TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1126526
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 03 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 03 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 30 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 17 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 17 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 29 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 29 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 30 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 April 2017 On time Download