THE SIGNPOST TO POLISH SUCCESS

Charity number: 1126928
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020
Total gross income £94.36k £42.63k £150.98k £131.67k £138.21k
Total expenditure £104.93k £98.78k £129.61k £122.51k £103.42k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £51.06k £7.75k £200 N/A N/A