ARTS GATEWAY MK

Charity number: 1126872
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £97.89k £91.88k £107.59k £128.72k £86.47k
Total expenditure £80.55k £102.48k £90.86k £147.18k £45.42k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £500 £16.20k £16.00k £33.00k £18.32k