THE WOMEN'S ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1127631
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing accessible, quality and gender sensitive enterprise; employment, education, management development services to women. Supporting women in the improvement of health and wellbeing. Stimulating research to support women's economic development. Influencing policy to improve the position of women. Delivering gender friendly incubator and meeting spaces. Maintaining a sustainable organisation

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 January 2009: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • WOMENS INTERNATIONAL CENTRE FOR ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SUSAN OSHIKANLU Chair
None on record
Lisa Pearson Trustee 13 June 2018
None on record
JULIE ANN GILLESPIE Trustee 13 June 2018
None on record
Jayne Croft Trustee 19 August 2016
None on record
Mona Mealey Trustee 08 April 2015
None on record
ALEX MORGAN Trustee 14 October 2011
None on record
GILLIAN ANNE MOGLIONE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £3.87m £4.85m £5.67m £5.47m £6.66m
Total expenditure £3.78m £4.74m £5.22m £4.94m £6.00m
Income from government contracts £1.87m N/A N/A N/A £4.66m
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £670 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £989.01k £0 £1.69m £1.02m £1.97m
Income - Charitable activities £2.88m £3.49m £3.98m £4.45m £4.66m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.84k £1.01k £159 £2.24k £32.75k
Income - Other £0 £1.36m £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.67m £4.66m £5.15m £4.82m £5.88m
Expenditure - Raising funds £113.38k £72.70k £69.42k £116.96k £116.84k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £17.05k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £5.02m £4.99m £4.99m £4.95m £4.91m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £2.31m £1.32m £1.55m £4.19m £4.34m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £3.11m £2.14m £1.92m £3.82m £3.28m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 01 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 01 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 06 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 14 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
54 ST. JAMES STREET
LIVERPOOL
LIVERPOOL
L1 0AB
Phone:
01517068111