CAFE JERICHO LIMITED

Charity number: 1131250
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £70.15k £69.62k £74.25k £64.08k £77.61k
Total expenditure £64.93k £66.26k £67.11k £71.51k £55.26k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.20k £3.40k £2.47k £2.90k £29.93k