Accounts and annual returns AL SHAADA ISLAMIC MISSION

Charity number: 1126851
Charity reporting is overdue by 1701 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 240 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 240 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 605 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 605 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 970 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 970 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1336 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1336 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1701 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1701 days