DAISYCHAIN BENEVOLENT FUND TRUST

Charity number: 1127100
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 15 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 07 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 07 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 03 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 03 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 21 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 21 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 30 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 30 September 2016 On time Download