Financial history DAISYCHAIN BENEVOLENT FUND TRUST

Charity number: 1127100
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £222.20k £224.33k £229.64k £163 £122.86k
Total expenditure £222.20k £224.33k £229.52k £0 £62.06k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A