Accounts and annual returns SHEFFIELD UNITED COMMUNITY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1126620
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 08 July 2022 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 08 July 2022 8 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 22 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 02 September 2020 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 02 September 2020 64 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 01 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 01 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window