Financial history SHEFFIELD UNITED COMMUNITY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1126620
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £1.05m £1.19m £1.56m £1.82m £1.95m
Total expenditure £986.32k £1.08m £1.19m £1.38m £1.67m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £46.79k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £78.19k £77.17k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.05m £1.19m £1.56m £1.74m £1.87m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £986.32k £1.08m £1.19m £1.38m £1.67m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0