SHEFFIELD UNITED COMMUNITY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1126620
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter Flower Trustee 02 December 2018 None on record
Princess Reem Bint Abdullah Bin Mosaad Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud Trustee 07 April 2021 None on record
Brett Simpson-Lyons Trustee 19 March 2019 None on record
Subhashis Basu Trustee 06 December 2018 None on record
DARREN BAKER Chair 20 May 2013 None on record
Vicki Anderson Trustee 01 October 2020 None on record
Mark Monteiro Trustee 18 December 2019 None on record
Professor Gill Valentine Trustee 19 February 2019 None on record
Dr Delroy Hall Trustee 16 March 2021 None on record
Gary Saville Trustee 19 March 2019 None on record