Financial history SOMERSET AND AVON RAPE AND SEXUAL ABUSE SUPPORT

Charity number: 1126682
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £511.95k £697.11k £725.88k £959.57k £1.52m
Total expenditure £574.52k £637.61k £765.13k £943.74k £1.28m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £484.34k £410.10k £358.05k £560.78k £1.04m
Income - Donations and legacies £13.41k £16.43k £27.20k £23.05k £52.64k
Income - Other trading activities £10.62k £14.73k £8.68k £9.10k £5.99k
Income - Charitable activities £484.34k £659.41k £685.83k £923.58k £1.45m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.55k £4.04k £3.92k £3.85k £3.27k
Income - Other £29 £2.50k £249 £0 £11.95k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £567.88k £629.01k £737.36k £918.66k £1.20m
Expenditure - Raising funds £6.32k £8.25k £27.72k £25.09k £79.70k
Expenditure - Governance £125 £759 £0 £1.91k £657
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £320 £355 £41 £0 £0