Financial history THE PRINCE OF WALES'S CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1127255
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £13.23m £14.80m £13.91m £10.35m £10.39m
Total expenditure £12.38m £13.42m £13.74m £10.42m £9.92m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.83m £5.54m £4.74m £4.36m £5.45m
Income - Other trading activities £9.31m £9.13m £8.99m £5.88m £4.74m
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £78.00k £128.00k £171.00k £117.00k £114.00k
Income - Other £0 £3.00k £0 £0 £87.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.51m £8.74m £8.81m £7.73m £9.12m
Expenditure - Raising funds £4.87m £4.68m £4.93m £91.00k £805.00k
Expenditure - Governance £88.75k £96.34k £141.02k £58.00k £72.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £4.78m £5.79m £5.92m £4.91m £5.01m
Expenditure - Investment management £34.00k £37.00k £39.00k £18.00k £39.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £2.59m £0