Accounts and annual returns THE DAVID GOLDMAN FOUNDATION ("THE TRUST")

Charity number: 1126784
Charity reporting is overdue by 110 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 110 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 110 days
Annual return 05 April 2020 06 July 2021 151 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 06 July 2021 151 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 09 March 2020 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 09 March 2020 33 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 18 April 2019 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

18 April 2019 72 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 24 April 2018 78 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 24 April 2018 78 days late Download Open in new window