THE DAVID GOLDMAN FOUNDATION ("THE TRUST")

Charity number: 1126784
Charity reporting is up to date (151 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £174.54k £156.53k £125.69k £139.53k £115.55k
Total expenditure £415.58k £457.60k £311.80k £291.38k £538.54k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A