THE ADVANCE CHARITABLE FUND UK

Charity number: 1130332
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The advancement of Australian arts, culture, heritage and science and promoting Australian national history and traditions. Promoting scientific research by Australia's leading institutions. The advancement of environmental protection by promoting the preservation of the natural environment of Australia and promoting civic responsibility.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £1,348

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England
  • Australia
  • United States

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 June 2009: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • THE ADVANCE EDUCATIONAL FUND UK (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
The Hon Jean Lopes Chair 01 December 2018
None on record
Oliver Hylton Trustee 25 March 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £51.11k £3.91k £604 £0 £0
Total expenditure £5.55k £2.81k £540 £101.96k £1.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 01 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 19 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 20 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 14 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 01 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 01 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
MHA MacIntyre Hudson
New Bridge Street House
30-34 New Bridge Street
LONDON
EC4V 6BJ
Phone:
+61410471867