THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CHURCH, RUSHDEN, NORTHAMPTONSHIRE

Charity number: 1126836
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £6.90k £5.36k £5.16k £2.57k £1.88k
Total expenditure £6.38k £6.44k £6.82k £1.96k £460
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A