SOUTH HARFORD & TUCKSWOOD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1126830
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £38.54k £27.07k £29.59k £52.55k £62.85k
Total expenditure £22.64k £24.86k £27.27k £34.64k £70.23k