Trustees STREET CHILD

Charity number: 1128536
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Anthony Wallersteiner MA, PHD Chair 01 April 2018
THE STOWE SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
STOWE COMMON ROOM BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
THE 1923 CHARITABLE TRUST
Overdue by 22 days
THE DAVID WYNNE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Christopher Queree Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record
Professor Mary Lynn Davies Trustee 02 November 2020
None on record
Daniel David Collison Trustee 02 November 2020
None on record
SARAH ELIZABETH HUGHES Trustee 02 November 2020
None on record
Gabriele Cipparrone Trustee 17 December 2019
None on record
Andrew White Trustee 17 December 2019
None on record
Kirti Mistry Trustee 17 December 2019
None on record
Andrea Vincenzo Salvato Trustee 11 September 2019
None on record
Dominic James Henry Ashcroft Trustee 11 September 2019
None on record
James Sean Ryan Trustee 11 September 2019
None on record
Gary James Heffernan Trustee 11 September 2019
None on record
Emanuel Kohnstamm Trustee 11 September 2019
None on record
Martinus Geradus Johannes Van Den Berg Trustee 11 September 2019
None on record
Nicholas Mason Trustee 17 June 2017
None on record
David Zachary Lloyd Trustee 14 November 2008
None on record