BIDDICK SPORTS COLLEGE COMMUNITY GYMNASTICS CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Biddick Gymnastics Community Sports College, Washington, continues to provides training for children of all ages. We hold at home competitions and displays, which includes all types of gymnasts at different levels, the most recent being the North of England floor and vault competition. On 8/9 and 14/15 May we have gymnasts at Stoke for the Schools and NDP Tumbling competition.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Sunderland
Governance
- 26 January 2009: Standard registration
- 17 November 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 17 November 2015: Funds transferred to 1157471 NORTHERN HOPE CENTRE LIMITED
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 30/09/2011 | 30/09/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.85k | £17.93k | £16.42k | £42.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.65k | £19.32k | £22.52k | £47.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2012 | 30 July 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2012 | 06 September 2013 | 38 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 JANUARY 2009
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE YOUNG PEOPLE OF WASHINGTON AND SURROUNDING AREAS IN TYNE AND WEAR, BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND COACHING OF GYMNASTICS.
Area of benefit
TYNE AND WEAR
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window