Financial history ACTION FOR FAMILY CARERS

Charity number: 1127164
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.62m £1.68m £687.55k £761.52k £806.55k
Total expenditure £1.69m £1.63m £802.76k £824.48k £789.42k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A £71.00k
Income from government grants £985.36k £947.00k £18.46k £158.54k £247.70k
Income - Donations and legacies £27.27k £27.14k £40.14k £67.63k £34.70k
Income - Other trading activities £6.32k £8.96k £5.76k £5.34k £1.88k
Income - Charitable activities £1.59m £1.64m £641.65k £683.00k £769.72k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £5.55k £245
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £10.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.69m £1.63m £802.00k £821.86k £789.41k
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.71k £1.65k £764 £2.63k £11
Expenditure - Governance £0 £4.32k £0 £0 £2.10k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0