Trustees ACTION FOR FAMILY CARERS

Charity number: 1127164
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REBECCA MARION LOADER Chair 23 October 2014
None on record
Duncan Lumley Trustee 16 October 2019
THE CHELMER CANAL TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
Tony Dixon Trustee 25 January 2018
None on record
Pauline Haggerty Trustee 20 October 2016
None on record
Sue Bailey Trustee 23 October 2014
None on record
Paul Alexander Osman Trustee 23 October 2014
None on record
DENISE FIELDING Trustee 27 October 2011
None on record
MRS JUDY SPICELEY Trustee
BLACKWATER BARRACUDAS (SWIMMING FOR THE DISABLED)
Received: On time
COLIN BENNETT Trustee
None on record