MANASSEH CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Charity number: 1127322
Charity reporting is up to date (89 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 January 2021 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 May 2020 187 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 28 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 26 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 24 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required