Accounts and annual returns THE STAINES PARISH COMMUNITY CARE TRUST

Charity number: 1131827
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 November 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 20 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 29 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 24 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 24 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window