THE FRIENDS OF CZECH HERITAGE

Charity number: 1127919
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 26 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 25 April 2020 542 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 21 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 02 March 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required