THE FRIENDS OF CZECH HERITAGE

Charity number: 1127919
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £24.20k £14.03k £27.40k £23.97k £10.21k
Total expenditure £17.49k £16.35k £12.11k £12.36k £7.63k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A