MAD 4 AFRICA

Charity number: 1127976
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £7.86k £373 £21.95k £54.04k £257.87k
Total expenditure £11.16k £231 £4.73k £34.73k £263.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A