Financial history ST MARY ISLINGTON COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1127269
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £692.99k £705.59k £652.59k £602.53k £638.29k
Total expenditure £653.67k £667.42k £645.09k £554.05k £631.00k
Income from government contracts £188.25k £211.72k £206.60k £207.41k £57.00k
Income from government grants £10.25k £7.91k N/A £58.05k £188.89k
Income - Donations and legacies £236.28k £234.24k £166.08k £252.18k £228.50k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £456.51k £470.83k £485.84k £350.04k £409.77k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £200 £515 £663 £305 £21
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £653.67k £667.42k £645.09k £554.05k £631.00k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £1.80k £2.85k £2.16k £1.68k £3.06k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0