Trustees SOUTHWATER RESPONDERS

Charity number: 1127511
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Robert Warde Trustee 01 February 2022
None on record
Claire Elizabeth Vickers Trustee 01 June 2021
None on record
Angela Small Trustee 26 May 2020
None on record
Nick Dowling Trustee 26 May 2020
None on record
Nancy Carol Brock Trustee 30 March 2020
None on record
Neil David Worth Trustee 01 January 2015
None on record
ANTHONY RICHARD BULL Trustee 01 January 2015
None on record
Damian Jon Cecil Trustee 01 January 2015
None on record
PETER ERIC BUCKLEY Trustee
None on record
PAULINE CARMELLA FLORES-MOORE Trustee
None on record