THE WORLDWIDE HOSPICE PALLIATIVE CARE ALLIANCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The WHPCA works through the collaboration and partnership with its member organisations to: a) Improve access to, and the quality of, palliative care worldwide b) Build a worldwide network of international and national palliative care organisations c) Provide or facilitate education and training in palliative care d) Increase awareness and understanding of hospice and palliative care
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

17 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- Argentina
- Armenia
- Australia
- Bangladesh
- Canada
- Ethiopia
- Greece
- India
- Ireland
- Jordan
- Kazakhstan
- Kenya
- Malaysia
- Nigeria
- Panama
- Philippines
- Sierra Leone
- Singapore
- South Africa
- Uganda
- Ukraine
- United States
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 16 January 2009: Standard registration
- THE WORLDWIDE PALLIATIVE CARE ALLIANCE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Ghauri Aggarwal | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Toby Porter | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Douglas Crispim | Trustee | 16 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Samy Alsirafi | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laurel Gillespie | Trustee | 11 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Babe Eunice Gorata Gaolebale | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Yoshiyuki Kizawa | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Meera Agar | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Maria Mercedes Marroquin | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Savita Butola | Trustee | 11 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stephen Watiti | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Agnes Csikos | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
DR Julia Dorothy Downing | Trustee | 10 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
DR James Francis Cleary | Trustee | 08 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Frank Patrick Brennan | Trustee | 08 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Professor Richard Harding-Swale | Trustee | 14 August 2016 |
|
|||||
Dr EMMANUEL LUYIRIKA | Trustee | 13 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £272.72k | £326.93k | £180.97k | £193.93k | £206.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £343.31k | £309.15k | £156.14k | £257.37k | £201.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £82.28k | £108.21k | £23.05k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/10/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/11/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19/11/2013
Charitable objects
TO FACILITATE AND PROMOTE THE RELIEF, CARE AND TREATMENT OF THE SICK, ESPECIALLY THE CHRONICALLY AND INCURABLY ILL AND THE DYING, AND THE SUPPORT AND CARE OF THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS AND OF THE BEREAVED, IN PARTICULAR BY: 1 IMPROVING ACCESS TO, AND THE QUALITY OF PALLIATIVE CARE, WORLDWIDE AND IMPROVING THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFICACY OF INSTITUTIONS CONCERNED WITH THE CHARITABLE PROVISION OF PALLIATIVE CARE; AND 2 PROVIDING OR FACILITATING EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN PALLIATIVE CARE AND INCREASING AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING AMONG THE GENERAL PUBLIC OF THE VALUES, PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICE OF HOSPICE AND PALLIATIVE CARE
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
34-44 Britannia Street
WHPCA
LONDON
WC1X 9JG
- Phone:
- +17039808737
- Email:
- info@thewhpca.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window