Accounts and annual returns WHITEHALL DOG RESCUE

Charity number: 1131552
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 05 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 05 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 15 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 15 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 21 October 2020 83 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 21 October 2020 83 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 22 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 22 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2017 09 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 09 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window