Accounts and annual returns CHALFONT ST PETER INFANT SCHOOL - SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1127195
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 14 October 2020 106 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 28 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 28 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 23 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 April 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2016 23 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 March 2017 On time Download Open in new window