Financial history CHALFONT ST PETER INFANT SCHOOL - SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1127195
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £60.16k £107.72k £7.68k £19.15k £15.73k
Total expenditure £36.59k £148.89k £19.65k £16.07k £12.09k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A