STAPLEHURST FREE CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are an independent evangelical community church, providing the opportunity for all to worship God, and to serve some of the many and diverse needs of the community of Staplehurst and also be involved in the wider mission of the church overseas. We strive to monitor the needs of the community matching them to our resources, identifying opportunities for offering God's love to those in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
- Medway
Governance
- 16 December 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roy Laming | Chair | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Minett | Trustee | 20 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Graham William Smith | Trustee | 20 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT FREDERICK HOWSE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TERENCE ROBERT HAWGOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £107.24k | £81.01k | £88.26k | £97.80k | £91.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £111.23k | £82.72k | £78.68k | £93.82k | £60.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 19 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 19 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 01 October 2021 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 01 October 2021 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 OCTOBER 2008
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN STAPLEHURST KENT AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY; (B) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN STAPLEHURST KENT AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Staplehurst Free Church
Station Road
Staplehurst
TONBRIDGE
TN12 0QQ
- Phone:
- 01580893993
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window