Financial history THE ASCENSION TRUST

Charity number: 1127204
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £459.07k £676.47k £473.78k £414.43k £714.73k
Total expenditure £494.10k £628.07k £577.22k £397.77k £418.94k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A £243.52k
Income from government grants £0 N/A £10.50k £76.59k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £254.84k N/A N/A £426.15k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £66.42k N/A N/A £18.66k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £350.24k N/A N/A £269.52k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A £502 N/A N/A £339
Income - Other N/A £4.46k N/A N/A £57
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £605.12k N/A N/A £342.59k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £22.95k N/A N/A £76.35k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 N/A N/A £3.53k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A £0