SOUTHWARK REFUGEE COMMUNITIES FORUM

Charity number: 1132229
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £33.00k £48.80k £33.44k £25.00k £22.63k
Total expenditure £23.82k £48.24k £37.10k £26.78k £24.33k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A £25.00k N/A
Income from government grants £0 £48.80k £25.00k N/A N/A