LATIN AMERICAN HOUSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bilingual nursery (English /Spanish) Free Legal and Social Welfare Advice Specialist Immigration Advice (has included EUSS Applications). Adult Learning Centre with Skills for life and work, digital inclusion and English courses. Spanish Saturday school for children, Community and Cultural Events Community Centre
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £136,070 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
27 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 22 December 2008: Standard registration
- 08 December 2011: Funds received from 293810 LATIN AMERICAN ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ENRIQUE SAENZ | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Mariann Soadd Sarquis Sepulveda | Trustee | 11 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maria Agustina Oliveri | Trustee | 06 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Henry Stanley Webb | Trustee | 24 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ines Marcela Hermida | Trustee | 24 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £420.17k | £445.27k | £390.85k | £447.46k | £485.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £398.17k | £396.87k | £431.54k | £481.35k | £486.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £39.59k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £39.59k | £56.00k | £33.54k | £135.92k | £136.07k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/10/2008
Charitable objects
PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF PREDOMINANTLY ALL LATIN AMERICAN PEOPLE PRINCIPALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY LIVING OR WORKING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, PARTICULARLY THE GREATER LONDON AREA, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE, POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS OR INDIVIDUALS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS; AND ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS. THE CHARITY SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM, ESPECIALLY GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
PRIORY HOUSE
KINGSGATE PLACE
LONDON
NW6 4TA
- Phone:
- 02073728653
- Email:
- info@casalatina.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window