Accounts and annual returns THE STATHAM FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1127476
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 24 August 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 04 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 04 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 24 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 24 February 2018 On time Download Open in new window