NEW LIFE COMMUNITY CHURCH (LEIGHTON BUZZARD)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mission Support: To further the Gospel internationally through means of training, finance and prayer. Discipleship and training: To use resources in order to equip others to achieve charitable objectives. Community Outreach: To impact our local community with hope and restoration through the Gospel. Children and Youth: To provide engaging and relevant opportunities for our young people to develop
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 23 December 2008: Standard registration
- 26 August 2022: Removed (Does not operate)
- 26 August 2022: Funds transferred to 1141928 SORTED COUNSELLING SERVICES
- 26 August 2022: Funds transferred to 1109107 BUZZER BUSES (DIAL A RIDE) LTD
- 26 August 2022: Funds transferred to 1108837 HOME-START UK
- 26 August 2022: Funds transferred to 1075789 KIDS OUT UK
- 26 August 2022: Funds transferred to 285908 WORLD VISION UK
- 26 August 2022: Funds transferred to 1062573 COMMUNITY ACTION ROMANIA
- 26 August 2022: Funds transferred to 1182990 LEIGHTON-LINSLADE HOMELESS SERVICE
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.39k | £29.25k | £15.51k | £14.22k | £14.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.58k | £61.17k | £15.66k | £16.88k | £11.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 29 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 29 October 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 5 DECEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN LEIGHTON BUZZARD IN THE COUNTY OF BEDFORDSHIRE AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE TRUST. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN LEIGHTON BUZZARD AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
GLOBAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window