Dogfen lywodraethu LEEDS AFGHAN EDUCATION CENTRE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 FEB 2009 AS AMENDED ON 26 FEB 2009 AS AMENDED ON 27 MAY 2012 AS AMENDED ON 20 FEB 2018 as amended on 05 Jun 2018 as amended on 15 Jun 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LEEDS AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS IN PARTICULAR THE AFGHAN COMMUNITIES, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX SEXUAL ORIENTATION, NATIONALITY, AGE, DISABILITY, RACE OR OF A POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE ( HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE " ) AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME( WHETHER ALONE OR IN COOPERATION WITH ANY STATUARY AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECT. TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED..
Maes buddion
LEEDS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.