Accounts and annual returns ACORN HUNGARY TRUST

Charity number: 1127958
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 14 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 14 November 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 10 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 27 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window