BALUJI MUSIC FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1130985
Charity reporting is up to date (24 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 February 2021 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 24 February 2021 24 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 30 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 24 February 2018 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 26 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 26 January 2017 On time Download