INSTITUTE OF PLASTIC SURGERY RESEARCH AND EDUCATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 21 January 2009: Standard registration
- 01 July 2011: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 01 July 2011: Funds transferred to 1140479 INSTITUTE OF PLASTIC SURGERY RESEARCH AND EDUCATIO...
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2010 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 SEPTEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PRACTICE OF CONSTRUCTIVE PLASTIC SURGERY BURNS AND ASSOCIATED DISCIPLINES CARRIED ON AT THE DEPARTMENT OF PLASTIC & RECONSTRUCTIVE SURGERY ROYAL FREE HAMPSTEAD NHK TRUST AND TO EDUCATE THOSE IN TRAINING IN RECONSTRUCTIVE PLASTIC SURGERY AND ALSO THOSE IN ASSOCIATED DISCIPLINES WORKING WITHIN THE SAID DEPARTMENT AND TO PROMOTE AND CARRY OUT RESEARCH IN RECONSTRUCTIVE PLASTIC SURGERY BURNS AND ASSOCIATED DISCIPLINES
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window