SELAH FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1130283
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 June 2020 29 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 June 2019 29 August 2020 150 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 June 2018 24 August 2019 145 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 June 2017 10 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 01 June 2016 16 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2016 Not Required