SELAH FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1130283
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/06/2016 01/06/2017 01/06/2018 01/06/2019 01/06/2020
Total gross income £21.40k £20.30k £24.54k £22.85k £16.65k
Total expenditure £20.70k £19.88k £27.79k £25.15k £12.29k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A