FRIENDS OF CHERNOBYL'S CHILDREN WOKING

Charity number: 1128063
Charity reporting is overdue by 119 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 119 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 119 days
Annual return 31 July 2019 12 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 12 December 2019 195 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 10 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 14 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required