FRIENDS OF CHERNOBYL'S CHILDREN WOKING

Charity number: 1128063
Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019
Total gross income £14.15k £10.82k £9.20k £7.95k £8.64k
Total expenditure £9.99k £9.86k £10.15k £10.38k £12.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A