Accounts and annual returns BROOKS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1127951
Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 29 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 29 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 29 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2020 10 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 14 October 2020 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 14 October 2020 14 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2018 02 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 02 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window